Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pomerantz, Judith, Schustek, William, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Parras, Jr., Esq., Michael Vincent, Sager, Esq., Gregory, against Goloboy, Andrew S., Goloboy Cpa Llc, represented by Fern, Esq., Samuel W, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Beverly J. Cannone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeverly J. Cannone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 01, 2021Amended: original complaint filed by Judith Pomerantz, William Schustek
Date: February 14, 2022ORDER: for appointment of Special Process Server (dated: 9/1/2021)
Date: September 01, 2021Judith Pomerantz, William Schustek's Memorandum in support of motion for real estate attachment
Date: September 01, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: September 01, 2021Plaintiffs(s) Judith Pomerantz, William Schustek's Motion for a Real Estate Attachment
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for a Real Estate Attachment (#3.0): Other action taken Defendant appeared without counsel and requested a further date for hearing where he has retained counsel who is unavailable today. Case continued without objection to March 8, 2022 at 2 pm. Court Ordered that subject property shall not be transferred and the value of the property shall not by in any way compromised pending the next date. (dated 2/8/2022) ns ni Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon
Judge: Donatelle, Sharon |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended: original complaint filed by Judith Pomerantz, William Schustek | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial ORDER: Hearing is continued to allow Defendant Goloboy's Attorney to appear at next hearing scheduled on 3/8/22 at 2PM by Video (Donatelle, J)(dated; 2/8/22) ns pl Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon
Judge: Donatelle, Sharon |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing for Real Estate Attachment scheduled on: 02/08/2022 02:30 PM Has been: Held via Video Conference Hon. Sharon Donatelle, Presiding
Judge: Donatelle, Sharon |
|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Short Order of Notice, returned SERVED Documents were left under the door of the last and usual place of abode on 1/27/2022 at 9:30am. (E-FILE received 1/31/2022) Applies To: Goloboy CPA LLC (Defendant) | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Short Order of Notice, returned SERVED Documents were served in hand to Andrew's wife, co resident of home and authorized to accept on 1/27/2022 at 9:30am. (E-FILE received 1/31/2022) Applies To: Goloboy, Andrew S. (Defendant) | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for a Real Estate Attachment (#3.0): Summons and Order of Notice to issue under this motion returnable 2/8/22 at 2:30pm by video (Donatelle, J)(dated; 1/21/22) ns pl Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon
Judge: Donatelle, Sharon |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Emailed Order of Notice and mailed original to attorney Sager | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons and order of notice issued on a Motion for a Real Estate Attachment , returnable on 02/08/2022 02:30 PM Hearing for Real Estate Attachment. | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing for Real Estate Attachment scheduled on: 11/23/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Request of Plaintiff Comments: Trying to resolve the issue. Hon. Cathleen E. Campbell, Presiding
Judge: Campbell, Cathleen E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.