Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
People'S United Bank National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hixon, Esq., Jonathan Michael, against Baden, Jerald J, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Mark C. Gildea presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i)
Date: July 12, 2018Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 22, 2016Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/22/2016 (IN HAND TO ATTORNEY)
Date: December 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 07/12/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Comments: voluntary dismissal in route Hon. Mark Gildea, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Mark Gildea |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for a Status Conference on Thursday, July 12, 2018 at 2:00 P.M. before the Honorable Mark Gildea in Courtroom 10 Sent On: 05/09/2018 10:50:04 | |
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Defendant is making payments to Plaintiff pursuant to the parties agreement. Plaintiff requests this matter be set for status in 180 days. (rec'd 10/12/17) | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review, if notice is not received by 10/13/2017 the complaint will be dismissed. | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Motion for Attachment scheduled for 02/22/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Joint request of parties | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding faxed letter recieved from Attorney Hixon requesting hearing of February 7,2017 be taken off by agreement and continued to Feb. 22,2017 | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Motion for Attachment scheduled for 02/07/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Joint request of parties | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Baden, Jerald J: Service made at last and usual; on 12/28/2016 at 8:04am (received 1/23/2017) Applies To: Baden, Jerald J (Defendant) | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request to continue hearing scheduled 1/4/17 (#5.0): ALLOWED continued to 2/7/17 at 2:00 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.