Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Graeber, Davis & Cantwell, P.C., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Davis, Iii, Esq., James H, against Sheehan, Peter, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Beverly J. Cannone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeverly J. Cannone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. Judge: Cannone, Hon. Beverly J cs
Date: January 07, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. Judge: Cannone, Hon. Beverly J cs
Judge: Cannone, Beverly J |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 11/13/2018 Judge: Cannone, Hon. Beverly J
Judge: Beverly JCannone |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: James H Davis, III, Esq. Defendant: Peter Sheehan Other interested party: Peter Sheehan Other interested party: Peter Sheehan | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled on: 10/30/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Beverly J Cannone, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Cannone, Beverly J |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER: Notice sent for Assessment of Damages hearing on Tuesday, October 30, 2018, Judge Cannone Presiding, Court Room 3 at 2:00 PM Judge: Cannone, Hon. Beverly J
Judge: Beverly JCannone |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event Motion to continue Assessment of Damages (#13.0): ALLOWED Case is continued to the October, 2018 Assessment of Damages list. (dated 5/29/18) notice sent dl Judge: Krupp, Hon. Peter B
Judge: Peter BKrupp |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled on: 05/29/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Peter B Krupp, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Krupp, Peter B |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Defendant Peter Sheehan's Joint Motion to continue / reschedule an event 05/29/2018 02:00 PM Damage Assessment Hearing until sometime after September 30, 2018 (fax) | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by James H Davis, III, Esq. for Attorney's Fees in support of Plaintiff's Assessment of Damages (rec'd 5/18/18) | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant Peter Sheehan is not in the Military (received 5/7/2018) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.