Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lancaster Enterprises Inc, Raftes, Marie, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Day, Esq., John Scott, against Division Of Administrative Law Appeals, Office Of The Attorney General, represented by Quinan, Jr., Esq., Robert L, Jones, Esq., Miranda Strassmann, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2012 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs, waiving all rights of appeal | |
September 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Joint Status Report - The parties jointly aver that they have successfully negotiated a resolution of all matters at issue in this litigation, and are awaiting a heairng in the District Court, currently scheduled for August 31, 2012, to fully and finally dispose of said matters. More specifically, the Parties have agreed that Respondent Office of the Attorney General will take out a criminal complaint in the District court to which Petitioners Marie Raftes and Lancaster Enterprises, Inc. will enter pleas of guilty pursuant to a written plea agreement that the Petitioners and Respondent Office of the Attorney General Parties previously have negotiated. As one of the terms of the written plea agreement, the Petitioners Marie Raftes and Lancaster Enterprises, Inc. have agreed to file a motion to dismiss the instant matter within two weeks following the entry of their guilty pleas in the District Court. Wherefore, the Parties respectfully move this Court for a stay of this proceeding for 60 days, in order to allow the Parties to finalize the above described proceedings in the District Court (Rec'd 8/27/12) | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice sent: of Status review with a return date of August 31, 2012 ( Fishman, RAJ) cs | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Return of Status Notice by Atty. John S. Day - Joint Status Report - The parties are awaiting receipt of the transcript of the administrative proceeding that is at issue in the Petition for Judicial Review. Moreover, the Petitioners and Respondent Office of the Attorney General are attempting to resolve this matter throught a settlement agreement that would render this proceeding moot. The Parties move this Court for a stay of this proceeding for 90 days in order to allow for the Parties to receive and review the hearing transcript and potentially resolve this litigation through settlement (rec'd 2/8/12) | |
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice sent: of Status review with a return date of Feb. 10, 2012 ( Fishman, RAJ) cs | |
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#9.0) Motion is ALLOWED by assent. Within 5 days (business) following receipt of the transcript from JMS Support Services, the Petitioners will provide copies of the same to the Respondents; 30 days following the filing of the transcript with the Court, the Petitioners will serve the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; 30 days later, the Respondents will serve their responses. The motion package will be filed promptly with the Court. (Kenneth Fishman, Regional Administrative Justice) dated August 12, 2011 Notices mailed 8/12/2011 | |
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Marie Raftes and Lancaster Enterprises Inc.'s Assented to MOTION to establish briefing schedule | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Deft. Division of Administrative Law Appeals' Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Administrative Record of Office of the Attorney General and Division of Administrative Law Appeals | |
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs review for answers' at service deadline review |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.