Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Winslow, Geoffrey, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case represented by Dever, Esq., Brian Christopher, against Federal Express Corporation, represented by Macphee, Esq., Lee Stephen, Giraud, Esq., Marie E., in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2011 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT as a result of Status: Clerk Follow UP: It is Hereby Ordered and Adjudged: That all remaining claims be dismissed without prejudice (Patrick F. Brady, Associate Justice). Copies mailed 9/6/2011 | |
September 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Return of Status Notice by Atty. Brian C. Dever - All parties agreee that the Court may dismiss all claims without prejudice (Rec'd 8/25/11) | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice sent: of Status review with a return date of August 24, 2011 ( Brady, J.) cs | |
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs review for answers' at service deadline review | |
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#1.0) Request for order is DENIED. Pre-action discovery - depositions, production of documents and entry upon premises for purposes of inspection -- is governed by Mass. R. Civ. P. 27. This Bill for Discovery fails to comply with the requirements of that Rule. Moreover, Rule 27 does not "sanction complaint - building discovery." Smith & Zobel, 6 Mass. Practice s. 27.1 (1996) (E. Susan Garsh, Associate Justice) dated March 11, 2011 Notices mailed 3/21/2011 | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Federal Express Corporation(Defendant)-tracking notice sent to Attorney MacPhee and Attorney Giraud | |
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: (summons) Federal Express Corporation(Defendant) served on 2/15/2011 in h to Gail Brown, process clerk, agent and person in charge at the time of service for Federal Express Corporation, at CT Corporation System | |
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | ONE TRIAL review by Clerk, Case is to remain in the Superior Court | |
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice sent: X track to plffs attorney | |
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.