Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Paadre, Taimi, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kraft, Esq., Bruce A, against Thomas Leonard Executor Of Estate Of Kevin John Kiernan, represented by Mackey, Esq., John, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2011 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs(rec'd3/2/12) | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Confirmatory Notice of Pre trial conference - pre trial conference will be held on April 26, 2012 at 2:00P.M. (cs) | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Return of Status Notice by Atty. Bruce A. Kraft - parties are requesting a pre trial confernce on April 26, 2012 (rec'd 12/5/11) | |
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice sent: of Status review with a return date of December 7, 2011 ( Garsh, J.) cs | |
April 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs status review' at service deadline review | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Thomas Leonard executor of Estate of Kevin John Kiernan(Defendant) and jury demand. Notice sent Fast Track to Defendant's Attorney | |
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | ONE TRIAL review by Clerk, Case is to remain in the Superior Court | |
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice sent: fast track to plffs attorney | |
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed | |
December 31, 2010 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type A99, Track F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.