Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Franks As Executrix, Barbara, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Murphy, Esq., Christine Anne, Allcock, Esq., Edmund Arthur, against Recycling Walpole Llc, represented by Hoyt, Esq., Drew W, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2011 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without cost including counterclaims | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Pleading, Stipulation of dismissal, returned to Christine A Murphy, Esq., for/or Barbara Franks As Executrix.: New stipulation to be filed to include counterclaim | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#18.0) ALLOWED. The discovery deadline is extended up to and including February 3, 2012. Any Rule 56 motions shall be served by March 5, 2012 and filed by April 6, 2012. A final pretrial conference shall be scheduled in July, 2012. (Patrick F. Brady, Associate Justice) dated December 23, 2011 Notices mailed 12/27/2011 | |
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Joint MOTION to extend scheduling order deadlines | |
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Return of Status Notice - Needs Discovery; Motion to dismiss recently denied (rec'd 8/8/11) | |
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#16.0) ALLOWED by assent. Discovery deadline is extended up to and including January 4, 2012; Rule 56 filing deadline is extended up to and including February 3, 2012; pretrial conference to be scheduled July, 2012. (Patrick F. Brady, Associate Justice) dated September 2, 2011 Notices mailed 9/2/2011 | |
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Parties' joint MOTION to amend tracking deadline((Rec'd. 9/1/2/201) | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice sent: of Status review with a return date of August 24, 2011 ( Brady, J.) cs | |
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER and Jury Demand: Barbara Franks as Executrix(Defendant/counterclaim) | |
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#11.0) After hearing, the Motion to dismiss Counterclaims is DENIED. Pursuant to G.L.c. 260, s. 36, the relevant statutes of limitations would not appear to bar those counterclaims, at least to the extent of off-set. Further, issue raised relating to the discovery rule may provide an additional grounds to surmount the statutes of limitations, as this would raise a fact issue, potentially, such that the claim is not precluded at the Rule 12 (b)(6) stage. See Salvas v Walmart, 452 Mass. 337, 377 (2008). Given these factors, the moving party is unable to demonstrate that the plaintiff-in-counterclaim has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (Thomas A. Connors, Associate Justice) dated May 18, 2011 Notices mailed 5/24/2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.