Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Provident Funding Associates Lp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by O'Donohue, Esq., John K, Manchini, Esq., Steven G, Caponigro, Esq., Stephanie, against Finn, Jeanne E, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 2010 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT authorizing the foreclosure of a mortgage (Sanders, J)(dated 3/1/2011) ns | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Jeanne E. Finn is defaulted | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion to take the complaint for confessed - Allowed (Sanders, J)(dated 2/4/2011) ns | |
February 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Amended complaint (received 9/22/10) . Order of Notice issued on 9/22/10 with a return date of November 9, 2010. | |
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Order of Notice - published in the Dedham Transcript, served on 10/21/2010 by leaving at l & u and recorded in the Norfolk County Registry of Deeds | |
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Jeanne E Finn is not in military service | |
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event | plffs motion to amend complaint and for new order of notice-motion allowed (Sanders,J.) (called attorney for the amended complaint) | |
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion (P#5.0) emergency motion to vacate judgment of dismissal- motion allowed (Connors,J) dated 4/30/10-notice sent 8/6/10 | |
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Emergency motion to vacate the judgment of dismissal | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Disposed: dismissd/no service' at service deadline review |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.