Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Parks, Joann, Abrams, Stanton V, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Abrams, Esq., Stanton V, against Norwood Cooperative Bank Aka, represented by Harvey, Esq., Lisa A, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 01, 2010 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, any and all claims asserted against defendant, Norwood Cooperative Bank | |
October 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 1/25/2010 at 2:00 P.M. | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Return of Status Notice by Atty. Lisa A. Harvey - Discovery still underway - request a pre trial conference in Jan. (rec'd 9/7/10) | |
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice sent: of Status review with a return date of September 8, 2010 (Connor, J.) cs | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs status review' at service deadline review | |
March 17, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Norwood Cooperative Bank aka(Defendant)(rec'd 3/15/10) - fast track notice sent to Defendant's attorney | |
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion for appointment of special process server- Allowed (Sanders, J)(dated 2/23/2010) | |
January 01, 2010 | Docket Event | ONE TRIAL review by Clerk, Case is to remain in the Superior Court | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice sent: fast track to plffs attorney | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.