Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
John Gaffney Trustee, Frances Clay Trustee, Marc Chase Trustee, Philip Trussell Trustee, William Ely Trustee, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Rubin, Esq., Diane, against Trustees Of Dedham -Stoneleigh Realty Trust, Cb Construction Inc, Dimella Shaffer & Associates, Paren Corporation, Dedham Stoneleigh Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Rosenthal, Esq., David S, Singer, Esq., James Steven, Hutchison, Esq., Warren D, Dunlap, Esq., Ben Nathan, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2008 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, without costs, including all claims and counterclaims | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Joint return of Status Notice - The parties to this action have negotiated a settlement which is condidtioned on receipt of settlement funds from a third-party, the Commonwealth of Massachusetts Division of Capital Asset Management(DCAM), among other things, Counsel are advised by DCAM that the required funds will be released in the near future. If those funds are received as expected, and the other conditions precedent are satisfied, counsel expect to be able to report the case settled at that time. As part of the settlement, the parties agreed to cooperate in seeking a stay of this action to permit the conditions precedent to occur. The parties seek the Court's continued cooperation to effectuate settlement (rec'd 1/29/08) | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice sent: of Status review with a return date of January 28, 2008 (Connor, J.) cs | |
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Stipulation to extend time for defendants to file an answer/responsive pleading to the complaint to 14 days following the completion of Mediation , if the Mediation does not result in the settlement of this action | |
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (order of notice): CB Construction, Inc. served July 3, 2007 in h to Phyllis O Baker, the receptionist for CB Construction | |
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (order of notice): Dimella Shaffer & Associates served Mr. Frank Dimella, as agent of service for Dimella Shaffer & Associates on 7/3/2007 | |
July 10, 2007 | Docket Event | Original of P# 6.0 | |
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Court received Letter from Diane Rubin of Holland and Knight, removing the Motion for PI set for July 10, 2007 by agreement (Faxed) | |
July 06, 2007 | Docket Event | ONE TRIAL review by Clerk, Case is to remain in the Superior Court | |
June 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice sent: fast track to plffs attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.