Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Lindsey B, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pearl, Esq., Scott, Heinlein, Esq., David William, against Holman, Brian, Holman, Sarah, represented by Anderson, Esq., Stephen G, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2008 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs. as to all claims by and between them | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 6/29/2009 (Barbara A. Dortch-Okara, Associate Justice) | |
February 06, 2009 | Docket Event | RE: P# 14.0: The within affidavit is stricken from the docket pursuant to M.R.C.P. 60(a) (Janet L Sanders, Regional Administrative Justice) Dated 2/6/2009 Notice sent 2/6/2009 | |
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Defts affidavit of written notice of intent to offer medical bills as evidence, pursuant to MGLc 233, sec 79G | |
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Pre-trial ORDER:After a pretrial on Dec.11,2008 the Court ORDERS:Trial with jury is scheduled for June 1,2009 at 9:00am (Dortch-Okara,J)(dated;12/11/08) ns | |
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulation of partial dismissal as to Brian Holman, with prejudice, without costs, as to all claims against Brian Holmlan only (Rec'd. 12/11/08) | |
December 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Joint pre-trial memorandum filed (Rec'd. 12/11/08) | |
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 12/11/2008 at 2:00 P.M. | |
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Return of Status Notice by Atty. David W. Heinlein - Please schedule a Pre trial conference during the months of November or December 2008 (rec'd 9/8/08) | |
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Return of Status Notice by Atty. Stephen G. Anderson - request a pre trial conference anytime in November or December. Discovery is not yet completed but I anticipate that it will be by the time the Pre trial is held (rec'd 9/4/08) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.