Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cacv Of Colorado Llc, filed a(n) Confirm,Vacate Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Cambece, Esq., James A, against Petithomme, Alix, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2008 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeConfirm,Vacate Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Execution issued to: Michael A. Lovell, J.A. Cambece Law Office Eight Bourbon Street, Peabody,Ma. 0l960 re: Alix Petithomme-damages: 4,072.89; cost: 314.31; interest to date of execution: 119.79 | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD case before (Connor,Justice IT IS ORDERED and ADJUDGED: That the plaintiff, CACV of Colorado, LLC, recover of the defendant Alix Petithomme damages in the amount of $3,993.03 plus statutory interest thereon from December 13,2007 and their costs of action true attested copies mailed 2/13/08 | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#5.0) ALLOWED no opposition (Connor,Justice) dated 2/12/08 Notices mailed 2/13/2008 | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | The Deft ALix Petithomme is defaulted under 55a failure to answer ns | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing(rec'd2/8/08) | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A.(rec'd2/8/08) | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed by CACV of Colorado LLC(rec'd2/8/08) | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Plaintiff CACV of Colorado LLC's MOTION to confirm Arbitration Award(rec'd2/8/08) | |
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Alix Petithomme by CACV of Colorado LLC | |
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED: (summons) Alix Petithomme (Defendant) served on 1/10/2008 by leaving at l & u |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.