Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Robert Sternberg Dba, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Broadley, Esq., Steven S, against Mcgrath, Thomas M, Nica Inc, represented by Murphy, Esq., Robert J, Hillygus, Esq., Joel David, Mcclure, Esq., Wesley Allan, in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2007 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice and without costs. the parties expressly waive all rights of appeal | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 8/14/2008 (John P. Connor, Jr., Associate Justice) | |
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Joint pre-trial memorandum filed (filed 4/29/08 in papers) | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Trial: Request for Jurors re Impanelment (50) for Monday, July 14, 2008 Judge John P. Connor, Jr., Room 20 | |
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Offer of judgment filed by Defts' | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Memorandum and Order on Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment see memo-ORDER For the foregoing reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendants' Motion for summary judgment is DENIED(Dortch=Okara,Justice dated 528/08 certtified copies mailed 5/29/08 | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion (P#16.0) DENIED: See Memorandum and order (Barbara A. Dortch-Okara, Associate Justice) dated 5/29/08 Notices mailed 5/29/2008 | |
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Court received Letter dated 5/19/08 from Steven S. Broadley, Esq., indicating the Plaintiff is traveling from California and would need advance notice of the trial date of 7/14/08 | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Pre-trial ORDER:After a pretrial on April 29,2008 the Court ORDERS:Trial with jury is scheduled for July 14,2008 at 9:00am (Dortch-Okara,J)(Dated;4/29/08)ns | |
April 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing on (P#16.0 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ) held, matter taken under advisement. (Barbara A. Dortch-Okara, Associate Justice) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.