Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Champion, Laurie, Farrell, Anne, Farrell, William, Formella, Jean Francois, Gaito, Jane, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Bailey, Iii, Esq., Daniel J, Pinto, Jr., Esq., Donald R, Quick, Esq., Joel, against Goldsmith, J Graham, Town Of Nantucket Conservation Commission And Its Members Solely In Their Official Capacity, Westmoor Club Llc, represented by Hunton, Esq., Michele Ann, Wood, Esq., Glenn A, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2022 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 22, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 22, 2022Affidavit of Service of Process
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Without Costs. Applies To: Farrell, William (Plaintiff); Farrell, Anne (Plaintiff); Champion, Laurie (Plaintiff); Formella, Jean Francois (Plaintiff); Holland, Thomas (Plaintiff); Michael Gaito Trustee of The Gaito Family Trust (Plaintiff); Jane Gaito Trustee of The Gaito Family Trust (Plaintiff); Town of Nantucket Conservation Commission and its Members solely in their Official Capacity (Defendant); Goldsmith, J Graham (Defendant); Westmoor Club LLC (Defendant) | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE Returned for Defendant Goldsmith, J Graham: Service via certified mail; Supplemental Proof of Service via FedEx Submitted on 2/13/2023 | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service of Process | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE Returned for Defendant Town of Nantucket Conservation Commission and its Members solely in their Official Capacity: Service via certified mail; Ashley Erisman, Chair and Nancy Holmes, Town Clerk | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE Returned for Defendant Westmoor Club LLC: Service made at last and usual; Alan Worden, as Manager of Westmoor Club, LLC | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearances: On this date Joel Quick, Esq., Daniel J. Bailey, Esq., and Donald R. Pinto, Jr. Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiffs William Farrell, Anne Farrell, Laurie Champion, Jean Francois Formella, Thomas Holland, and Michael Gaito and Jane Gaito, Trustees of the Gaito Family Trust | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 12/22/2022 | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Joel Quick, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Jane Gaito |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.