Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nantucket Memorial Airport Commission, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Naughton, Jr., Esq., Harold P, against Achroma U.S. Inc., Agc Chemicals Americas Inc., Amerex Corporation, Archroma U.S. Inc., Arkema Inc., (total of 28) See All in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case transferred to another court. | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendants Tyco Fire Product, LP Individually and as Successor to The Ansul Company, Chemguard Inc.'s Notice of Removal (U.S. District Court) | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Tyco Fire Product, LP Individually and as Successor to The Ansul Company, Chemguard Inc.'s Notice of Filing Notice of Removal | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 09/01/2021 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. Applies To: Nantucket Memorial Airport Commission (Plaintiff) | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.