Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pinson, Henry, Silverman, Lynn G, Silverman, William, Werner, Harold, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Corner, Esq., Mark Westbrook, against Nantucket Conservation Commission, Nantucket Islands Land Bank, represented by Boutwell, Esq., Robert C, Fitch, Esq., Jonathan W, Pucci, Esq., George X, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2014 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Amended: amended complaint filed by Lynn G Silverman, Harold Werner, Henry Pinson
Date: March 24, 2014Complaint - Filing fee $285.00 received
Date: March 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Record assembled; notice (9d) to clerk of Appeals Court with 2 certified copies of docket entries; notice mailed 12/12/14 to attys Mark W. Corner and George X. Pucci | |
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Transcript of testimony, Vol #1 received in PDF format on CD from Wendy Ferrelli, Approved Court Transcriber | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Court Reporter OTS is hereby notified to prepare one copy of the transcript of the evidence of 07/17/2014 11:00 AM Rule 12 Hearing by plaintiffs pursuant to MRAP Rules 9(c)(2) and 8(b)(3) | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice to Judge re: notice of appeal Applies To: Silverman, Lynn G (Plaintiff); Werner, Harold (Plaintiff); Pinson, Henry (Plaintiff) | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Request for copy of JAVS system recording received from OTS. CD of 07/17/14 recording sent to the Office of Transcription Services | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | On 10/23/2014, Plaintiffs Lynn G. Silverman, Harold Werner, and Harry C. Pinson filed a Notice to Appeal from the Final Judgment which was entered on 09/25/2014. Copy of Notice of Appeal mailed to GXP/JWF/RCB. In addition, appeal from all underlying findings and rulings, including the Court's Order allowing the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, dated August 13, 2014 and September 25, 2014. | |
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Court received Notice of Appeal related to appeal Applies To: Silverman, Lynn G (Plaintiff); Werner, Harold (Plaintiff); Pinson, Henry (Plaintiff) | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT on Defendant's, Nantucket Conservation Commission's 12b motion to dismiss (Peter M. Lauriat, Justice). Copies mailed 9/26/2014 | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT on Defendant's, Nantucket Islands Land Bank's 12b motion to dismiss (Peter M. Lauriat, Justice). Copies mailed 9/26/2014 | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#16) Upon review, and for the reasons set forth in the Court's Memorandum of Decision and Order dated August 13, 2014, this motion is ALLOWED (Peter M. Lauriat, Justice) 09/25/14. Notices faxed and mailed 9/25/2014 JWF/RB/MWC/GXP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.