Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Donal C. And Jonathan B. O'Brien, Jr. & O'Brien, Ttees Katherine L.S. O'Brien Qprtrust, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Orsmond, Esq., Gareth I, Bailey, Iii, Esq., Daniel J, against William F. Hunter, Trustee Of Water'S Edge Nominee Trust, Jennifer Karberg, As Member Of Town Of Nantucket Conservation Commission, Michael Glowacki, As Member Of Town Of Nantucket Conservation Commission, Ian Golding, As Member Of Town Of Nantucket Conservation Commission, Andrew Bennett, As Member Of Town Of Nantucket Conservation Commission, (total of 9) See All represented by Wood, Esq., Glenn A, Pucci, Esq., George X, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2014 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal all parties to the above action with prejudice, without costs or attorney's fees to any party. By fax 06/25/14. Rec'd originals 06/27/14. | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order issued in action for Judicial Review of an Administrative Agency proceeding under G. L. C. 30A, Sec 14 for hearing on 9/25/2014 at 12:00pm (Lauriat, J) Copies mailed 6/17/2014 GXP/GID/DJB/GAW | |
June 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Administrative Record of the Town of Nantucket Conservation Commission (Defendant) | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Atty George X Pucci's notice of appearance for Town of Nantucket Conservation Commission and its members (defenants) | |
November 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Tracking Order X Admin Agency Appeal sent to attys. | |
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance by Gareth I Orsmond with proof of service of complaint re: Town of Nantucket Conservation Commission and Wimmiam F. Hunter, Trustee of Water's Edge Nominee Trust | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type E03, Track A. | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Track changed to X, Origin 1, Type E02. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.