Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Glowacki, Greg W., Glowacki, Sr., David D., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Gerstle, Esq., Helene, against Glowacki, Walter J., represented by Kyburg, Esq., Peter D, in the jurisdiction of Nantucket County, MA, . Nantucket County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2012 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNantucket County, MA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT on Finding of Court on in favor of plaintiff David D. Glowacki, Sr.'s declaratory judgment claim (Count VI) of the complaint. Applies To: Glowacki, Sr., David D. (Plaintiff); Glowacki, Walter J. (Defendant) | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs as to David D. Glowacki, Sr.'s original complaint and all claims raised in Walter J. Glowacki's Answer and Defenses | |
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Status Review scheduled for 10/27/2014 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled Appeared: | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 10/25/2014 (Peter M. Lauriat, Justice) | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion of Donald R. Lassaman, Chapter 7 Trustee, to Employ Helene Gerstle As Special Counsel. Approved by William C. Hillman, Justice U.S. Bankruptcy Court 04/08/13 | |
September 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Assented to request for 30 day Nisi Order | |
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice sent by facsimile to appear (in person or by telephone) for pre-trial conference on 9/4/2014 at 3:00pm hg, pk | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Trial ORDER and Sept 2014 Trial List on 7/21/2014 (Lauriat, J) PK/HG | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#33) ALLOWED to the extent that it does not delay September 2014 trial. (Lauriat, J). | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Joint MOTION to continue Pre-trial Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.