Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Sherman Acquisition L.P., filed a(n) Civil case represented by David C Scott, against Wanda L. Wright, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior Court of Napa - Civil.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2004 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Napa - Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2004 | Action |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Sep 8 2004 Type: 213110 - MCV-Dismissal: Other Manner : 211110 - Before Trial: No Trial Date Set |
|
September 08, 2004 | Action |
Dismissal 271110-Dismissal-Full Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
August 23, 2004 | Action |
Satisfaction 234110-Case Management Conf. Statement Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
August 13, 2004 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 235210-OSC: Failure to File Proof; Serman Acquisition, L.P. v Wright, Wanda (L) ; Judge: J21150 Snowden W. Scott Judge: W. Scott Snowden |
|
August 02, 2004 | Action |
Satisfaction 234110-Case Management Conf. Statement Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 07, 2004 | Action |
Documents Prior to 5-17-05 DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 |
|
April 07, 2004 | Action |
Summons: Issued and Filed 231110-Summons Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 01, 1800 | Action |
Other DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 ; ; ; ; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.