Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Medical Center, Beth Israel Deaconess, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts Middlesex County Probate and Family Court with William F 7 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2023 |
CategoryProbate Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseMiddlesex County Probate and Family Court |
Affidavit In support of motion for speedy hearing and short notice
Date: March 08, 2023Motion For virtual hearing
Date: March 08, 2023Petition for Special Proceeding in re: a Health Care Proxy
Date: March 08, 2023Motion For specific counsel
Date: March 08, 2023Motion For Speedy Hearing and short notice
Date: March 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Decree on Special Proceeding in re: a Health Care Proxy dated: 3/22/2023 Judge: McSweeny, III, Hon. William F | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Resulted: Motion scheduled on: 03/22/2023 08:30 AM Has been: Judgment/Decree Issued Hon. William F McSweeny, III, Presiding | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion For Appointment of specific counsel ALLOWED on 03/09/2023 File Reference # 3 Judge: McSweeny, III, Hon. William F | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit In support of motion for speedy hearing and short notice | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion For virtual hearing | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Special Proceeding in re: a Health Care Proxy | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion For specific counsel | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion For Speedy Hearing and short notice | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Fee Generating Appointment, David J R Ulwick, Esq. appointed as A Counsel for Incapacitated/Protected Adult On 03/08/2023 by Hon. Thomas J Barbar Reason: Appointee's appointment requested in the petition | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Regarding Indigency Status, Contribution to Cost of Counsel and $150 Counsel Fee Judge: McSweeny, III, Hon. William F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.