Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Griffin, Alexander C., filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Burns-Hill, Brooke, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts Middlesex County Probate and Family Court with Klug-Cafazzo, Hon. Terri L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryPaternity Managed |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court HouseMiddlesex County Probate and Family Court |
Motion For 50/50 Custody
Date: July 29, 2022Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: July 29, 2022Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody
Date: July 29, 2022Complaint for Custody, Support, Parenting Time
Date: July 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Notice and Order Sent Judge: Klug-Cafazzo, Hon. Terri L. Event: Pretrial Conference Domestic and Equity Date: 11/10/2022 Time: 10:00 AM
Judge: Klug-Cafazzo, Terri L. |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Motion scheduled on: 08/04/2022 08:30 AM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Terri L. Klug-Cafazzo, Presiding
Judge: Klug-Cafazzo, Terri L. |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion For 50/50 Custody | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for Custody, Support, Parenting Time | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons issued on complaint for Custody/Support/Parenting Time. | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indigency Approved by Elizabeth Cabral on 07/29/2022 | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indigency Filed | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Birth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.