Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lozowicki, Patricia, filed a(n) Equity Complaint case represented by Scult, Esq., Ellen Borkum, against Hagar, Allen B., Hagar, Paul A, Hagar, Thomas E, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts Middlesex County Probate and Family Court with Bisenius, Hon. Theresa A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryEquity Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
|
Filing Court HouseMiddlesex County Probate and Family Court |
Complaint
Date: July 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment on complaint for declaratory judgement filed 7-29-22 Judge: Bisenius, Hon. Theresa A | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance of Thomas E Hagar, Pro Se | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Agreement Dated 02/28/2023 | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Motion scheduled on: 02/28/2023 08:30 AM Has been: Judgment/Decree Issued Hon. Theresa A Bisenius, Presiding
Judge: Bisenius, Theresa A |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit In Support of Motion for Enlargement of Time WOF | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion For Enlargement of Time WOF | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit In Support of Supplemental Argument and Motion to Reconsider WOF | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Supplemental Argument for Motion to Reconsider Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim One WOF | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Assented Motion For Virtual Hearing WOF | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit In Opposition to Motion to Reconsider WOF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.