Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Patel, Asmita vs. Patel, Rajender
On July 29, 2022 a divorce 1b case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA. Judge Jennifer M presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 29, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 03, 2024
Filing Location
Middlesex County, MA
Filing Court House
Middlesex County Probate and Family Court
Judge
Hon. Jennifer M
Category
Domestic Relations
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Further Order dated 06/07/2024,
Date: Jun 11, 2024Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody
Date: Jul 29, 2022Motion
Date: Jul 29, 2022Complaint for Divorce - Irretrievable Breakdown 1B
Date: Jul 29, 2022Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed by
Date: Jul 29, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Further Order dated 06/07/2024, Image Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Further Order dated 06/07/2024, | |
June 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Motion scheduled on: 06/06/2024 09:00 AM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Manisha H. Bhatt, Presiding
Judge: Bhatt, Manisha H. |
|
June 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion For Srvc. by Alt Means and Aff. of Diligent Search ALLOWED on 05/30/2024 File Reference # 46 | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion To Withdraw As Counsel For Defendant ALLOWED on 04/08/2024 File Reference # 43 | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion To Continue/Reschedule ALLOWED on 04/08/2024 File Reference # 38 | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Pretrial Continued scheduled on: 04/08/2024 10:00 AM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Michelle A Yee, Presiding
Judge: Yee, Michelle A |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Asmita Patel's Pretrial Memorandum | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion To Withdraw As Counsel For Defendant | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Financial Statement Applies To: Patel, Asmita (Plaintiff) Patel, Asmita |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Financial Statement Applies To: Patel, Asmita (Plaintiff) | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion To Continue/Reschedule ALLOWED on 02/16/2024 File Reference # 37 Judge: Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion To Continue/Reschedule | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Joint Motion To Continue/Reschedule | |
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Financial Statement Judge: Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. Applies To: Patel, Rajender (Defendant)
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Order dated 12/18/2023, Scheduling Judge: Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. | |
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Order dated 12/18/2023, Scheduling | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Status Conference scheduled on: 12/18/2023 08:30 AM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Jennifer M. Allen, Presiding
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Notice and Order Sent Judge: Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. Event: Pretrial Conference Domestic and Equity Date: 02/13/2024 Time: 11:00 AM Result: Case Not Heard and Rescheduled
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Financial Statement of W | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Notice and Order Sent Judge: Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. Event: Pretrial Conference Domestic and Equity Date: 02/13/2024 Time: 11:00 AM
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order dated 11/07/2023, Scheduling | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Pretrial Conference Domestic and Equity scheduled on: 11/07/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Jennifer M. Allen, Presiding
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Appearance by Attorney, Jarod C Harsha, Esq.,Party Name Rajender Patel | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary/Scheduling Order 09/15/2023 Judge: Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Order dated 09/15/2023, on Motion File Reference #17 | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion To Withdraw as Counsel ALLOWED on 09/15/2023 File Reference # 16 | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Pretrial Conference Domestic and Equity scheduled on: 09/15/2023 08:30 AM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Jennifer M. Allen, Presiding
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Notice and Order Sent Judge: Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. Event: Pretrial Conference Domestic and Equity Date: 11/07/2023 Time: 02:00 PM Result: Order Issued
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation of the Parties | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Rajender Patel's Pretrial Memorandum | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Asmita Patel's Pretrial Memorandum | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Financial Statement Applies To: Patel, Asmita (Plaintiff) | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Financial Statement Applies To: Patel, Rajender (Defendant) | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Appearance by Attorney, Todd D Beauregard, Esq.,Party Name Asmita Patel | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit In Support of Motion to Compel | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion To Compel | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion To Withdraw Applies To: Gage, Esq., Bruce A (Attorney) on behalf of Patel, Rajender (Defendant) | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary/Scheduling Order 05/09/2023, On complaint for Divorce | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion To Continue/Reschedule Defendant's DENIED on 05/09/2023 File Reference # 13 | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Notice and Order Sent Judge: Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. Event: Pretrial Conference Domestic and Equity Date: 09/15/2023 Time: 08:30 AM Result: Order Issued
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Pretrial Conference Domestic and Equity scheduled on: 05/09/2023 09:00 AM Has been: Order Issued Hon. Jennifer M. Allen, Presiding
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant's Motion To Continue/Reschedule | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Appearance by Attorney, Bruce A Gage, Esq.,Party Name Rajender Patel | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary/Scheduling Order | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To Merge The Separate Support Complaint With 1B Complaint For Divorce ALLOWED on 10/25/2022 File Reference # 5 | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Notice and Order Sent Judge: Allen, Hon. Jennifer M. Event: Pretrial Conference Domestic and Equity Date: 05/09/2023 Time: 09:00 AM Result: Order Issued
Judge: Allen, Jennifer M. |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons issued on complaint for Divorce Filed 07/29/2022. | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | **Entered in Error** Motion In | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed by | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To Merge with Separate Support Complaint | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Mass. Statistical R408 Form | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for Divorce - Irretrievable Breakdown 1B | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Marriage | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for Divorce - Irretrievable Breakdown 1B | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed by | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Mass. Statistical R408 Form | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of |