Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Dokus, Judith, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Sladen, Esq., Diana, against Dokus, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts Middlesex County Probate and Family Court with Klug-Cafazzo, Hon. Terri L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseMiddlesex County Probate and Family Court |
Complaint for Divorce - Irretrievable Breakdown 1B
Date: July 29, 2022Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: July 29, 2022Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed by
Date: July 29, 2022Notice of appearance
Date: July 29, 2022Motion To File Late Marriage Certificate
Date: July 29, 2022Motion To File Late Marriage Certificate ALLOWED on 08/10/2022 File Reference # 6
Date: August 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To File Late Marriage Certificate ALLOWED on 08/10/2022 File Reference # 6 | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons issued on complaint for Divorce Filed 07/29/2022. | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for Divorce - Irretrievable Breakdown 1B | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Uniform Counsel Certification Form Filed by | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of appearance | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion To File Late Marriage Certificate | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Mass. Statistical R408 Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.