Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Marshall, Shelagh, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Graff, Esq., Lisa J, against Marshall, Terry A, represented by Pro Se, Shiner, Esq., Marlene, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts Middlesex County Probate and Family Court with Bisenius, Hon. Theresa A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations |
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseMiddlesex County Probate and Family Court |
This complaint is a divorce case filed by Shelagh Marshall against Terry Marshall. Shelagh Marshall, the plaintiff, resides at 27 Maille Ave Dracut Middlesex, MA 01826, while Terry Marshall, the defendant, resides at 6310 South State Hwy 360-Unit 532...
Temporary Order Dated 08/24/2022 Judge: Bisenius, Hon. Theresa A
Date: October 07, 2022Order 08/24/2022, #14 Judge: Bisenius, Hon. Theresa A
Date: October 07, 2022Motion To Compel
Date: November 29, 2022Motion To Continue/Reschedule Joint ALLOWED on 10/25/2022 File Reference # 32
Date: November 09, 2022Temporary Order 12/02/2022 Judge: Bisenius, Hon. Theresa A
Date: December 22, 2022Order 12/02/2022, On Motion File Reference #30
Date: December 22, 2022Motion To Withdraw as Counsel ALLOWED on 11/29/2022 File Reference # 31
Date: December 22, 2022Order 11/29/2022, On Motion File Reference #37
Date: December 22, 2022Affidavit Of Counsel
Date: March 28, 2023Temporary Order 03/31/2023, Judge: Bisenius, Hon. Theresa A
Date: April 05, 2023Summons Filed, Date of Service 01/24/2023
Date: March 28, 2023Order 03/31/2023, Judge: Bisenius, Hon. Theresa A
Date: April 05, 2023Subsequent Action Contempt Filed
Date: January 03, 2023Amended Complaint For Contempt
Date: January 23, 2023Plaintiff's Motion For Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 (b) w/o File
Date: March 09, 2023Motion To Schedule Hearing w/o File
Date: March 09, 2023Motion To Continue/Reschedule
Date: September 26, 2022Motion To Appoint GAL w/o File
Date: September 22, 2022Joint Motion To Continue/Reschedule WOF
Date: August 04, 2022Answer to Counterclaim for Divorce
Date: July 22, 2022Motion To Continue/Reschedule ALLOWED on 06/27/2022 File Reference # 19
Date: July 18, 2022Motion For Temporary Custody DENIED on 06/17/2022 File Reference # 11
Date: July 18, 2022Answer and Counterclaim WOF
Date: July 05, 2022Summons Filed, Date of Service 06/17/2022 wof
Date: June 30, 2022Appearance by Attorney, Marlene Shiner, Esq.,Party Name Terry Marshall WOF
Date: June 28, 2022Assented to Motion To Continue/Reschedule
Date: June 27, 2022Plaintiff's Motion For Temporary Orders w/o File
Date: June 21, 2022Affidavit Of Colleen Reidy
Date: June 17, 2022Affidavit Of Shelagh Marshall
Date: June 17, 2022Ex Parte Motion For Temporary Custody
Date: June 17, 2022Amended Complaint for Divorce
Date: May 04, 2022Affidavit Of Shelagh Marshall
Date: January 03, 2022Motion For emergency temporary custody & abuse prevention order
Date: January 03, 2022Motion To File Late
Date: January 03, 2022Affidavit Disclosing Care and Custody
Date: January 03, 2022Complaint for Divorce
Date: January 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Taken Under Advisement: Trial 1 Day scheduled on: 04/19/2024 09:00 AM Has been: Under Advisement Hon. Theresa A Bisenius, Presiding
Judge: Bisenius, Theresa A |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Images Not Available for Public View - FAMILY SERVICE CLINIC REPORT (PARENTING TIME/CUSTODY) | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Images Not Available for Public View - FAMILY SERVICE CLINIC REPORT (CHILD INTERVIEW) | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Order dated 03/22/2024, on Complaint for Contempt | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion To Consolidate ALLOWED on 03/22/2024 File Reference # 92 | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Assented to Motion To Consolidate | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Filed, Date of Service 02/12/2024 | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Subsequent Action Contempt Filed | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Order dated 01/02/2024, parties have stipulated to the value | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion For update of court clinician's report & release to counsel ALLOWED on 01/02/2024 File Reference # 84 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.