Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bpi Construction Management Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lawlor, Esq., Andrew, against Blueprint Builders, Inc., Borges, Rodrigo, Desa, Breno, represented by Entner, Esq., John, Mangones, John A, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Freniere, Diane presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 26, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by BPI Construction Management, Inc. ("BPI") against Rodrigo Borges, Breno Desa, and Blueprint Builders, Inc. The complaint alleges violations of the Trade Secrets Act and the Computer Fraud and Abuse Act. BPI is a constructio...
Affidavit of Rodrigo Borges
Date: November 01, 2023Amended: amended complaint filed by BPI Construction Management Inc.
Date: November 17, 2023Affidavit of Ciao Xavier
Date: October 26, 2023Plaintiff(s) BPI Construction Management Inc.'s Motion to Short Order of Notice
Date: October 26, 2023Affidavit of Diogo Pessoa
Date: October 26, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: October 26, 2023Affidavit of Joseph D. Ganley
Date: October 26, 2023Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Rodrigo Borges, Breno Desa, Blueprint Builders, Inc.'s Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants Rodrigo Borges, Breno Desa, Blueprint Builders, Inc.'s Motion to dismiss all counts of the Amended Complaint | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Applies To: BPI Construction Management Inc. (Plaintiff) | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendants Rodrigo Borges, Breno Desa, Blueprint Builders, Inc.'s Notice of motion to dismiss pursuant to rule 9E. | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended: amended complaint filed by BPI Construction Management Inc. | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (See 7 pages) Accordingly, for the foregoing reasons, the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is ALLOWED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Decision and Order scanned and emailed to counsel of record with email addresses contained in MassCourts. Hard copy of decision mailed to other parties/counsel. | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 11/02/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon Diane Freniere, Presiding Staff: Martha Fulham, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Freniere, Diane |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Rodrigo Borges | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff(s) BPI Construction Management Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction: RE:P#4 filed by Applies To: Borges, Rodrigo (Defendant); Blueprint Builders, Inc. (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.