Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Allaby, Catherine, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Cook, Esq., Colleen C, against Gomes, Vinicius, Thomas, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Joshua I. Wall presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2023 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: March 08, 2023Original civil complaint filed.
Date: March 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Catherine Allaby's Notice to defendants of assessment of damages hearing currently scheduled for 9/21/23 at 3:00 p.m. | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Vinicius Gomes d/b/a WV Construction Pro, Inc., notices from the Worcester Telegram & Gazette attached, dated 7/14/23, 7/21/23 & 7/28/23. Applies To: Vinicius Gomes Doing Business as WV Construction Pro, Inc (Defendant) | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Catherine Allaby's request for Default 55(a) (renewed request) Applies To: Vinicius Gomes Doing Business as WV Construction Pro, Inc (Defendant) | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Catherine Allaby's Motion for Assessment of Damages and Default Judgment Against Defendant Anthony Thomas d/b/a Thomas Excavation and Construction Pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(b)(2) | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Catherine Allaby's Motion to Extend Time to File for Default Judgment by 14 Days | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Request for Default against Defendant Vinicius Gomes or, Alternatively, Motion for Order of Notice and to Extend Time Limit for Service (#10.0): Other action taken the request to extend time limit is ALLOWED and the Court ORDERS notice for service in Worcester Telegram and Boston Globe. Judge: Wall, Hon. Joshua
Judge: Wall, Joshua |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER: of notice by publication hereof of an attested copy in the Worcester Telegram & Gazette and the Boston Globe once a week for three successive weeks, the last publication to be twenty days at least before the return date of August 28, 2023. Judge: Wall, Hon. Joshua
Judge: Wall, Joshua |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons, returned INCOMPLETE See Scan Applies To: Vinicius Gomes Doing Business as WV Construction Pro, Inc (Defendant) | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Counsel Regarding Service of Process and in Support of Request for Default against Defendant Vinicius Gomes Applies To: Cook, Esq., Colleen C (Attorney) on behalf of Allaby, Catherine (Plaintiff) | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Catherine Allaby's Request for Default against Defendant Vinicius Gomes or, Alternatively, Motion for Order of Notice and to Extend Time Limit for Service (Memorandum of Law Incorporated) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.