Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Connell, William C., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Marcucci, Esq., Michael T, Mooney, Esq., Rose M, against Morrissey, Robert J., represented by Notis-Mcconarty, Esq., Edward, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Christopher K Barry-Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Robert J. Morrissey
Date: October 02, 2023Defendant Robert J. Morrissey's Motion to dismiss all counts (and Oral Argument Requested)
Date: October 02, 2023Answer to original complaint Applies To: Morrissey, Robert J. (Defendant)
Date: May 01, 2023Robert J. Morrissey's Reply Memorandum to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 03, 2023Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by William C. Connell
Date: October 03, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: March 07, 2023Complaint electronically filed.
Date: March 07, 2023Declaration of Michael T. Marcucci, Esq. in support of #9 motion.
Date: October 12, 2023Plaintiff William C. Connell's Request for hearing.
Date: October 12, 2023Reply/Sur-reply Plaintiff's reply memorandum to defendant's opposition to #9 motion.
Date: October 12, 2023Declaration of Rose M. Mooney, Esq. in support of #9 motion.
Date: October 12, 2023Opposition to #9 motion. filed by Robert J. Morrissey
Date: October 12, 2023William C. Connell's Memorandum of law in support of #9 motion.
Date: October 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 01/31/2024 03:00 PM Has been: Held - Under advisement Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Michael T Marcucci, Esq., Defendant Robert J. Morrissey Edward Notis-McConarty, Esq., Private Counsel Staff: Dia S Roberts-Tyler, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Barry-Smith, Christopher K |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Rose M Mooney, Esq. added for Plaintiff William C. Connell | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled on: 12/07/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Camille Sarrouf, Presiding Staff: Debra J Newman, Assistant Clerk | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Note: NOTICE OF RECUSAL : The present matter, currently before this court, in the assigned "B" session, on plaintiff's motion to compel production of documents and answers to interrogatories by the defendant (Paper #9), was in the process of being reviewed by this judge until there was an understanding that a third-party related to the proceedings, Pamela Morrissey Connell ("Ms. Connell"), is known and has been known to me for decades dating back to a common hometown (Belmont, MA) and further through a social media platform. Subjectively, I know that reviewing, hearing, and/or ruling upon the present motion would not create any manner of conflict requiring recusal. However, understanding the objective standard, one by which any decision would/could be viewed, would identify that there exists the potential for conflict. Based upon the foregoing I provide this Notice for the purpose of re-assignment, by the Regional Administrative Justice, of this specific motion and/or other motions or any trial of this matter during the time in which I would preside in the "B" session. | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Michael T. Marcucci, Esq. in support of #9 motion. | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff William C. Connell's Request for hearing. | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff William C. Connell's Notice of filing pursuant to rule 9A and list of documents filed. | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply Plaintiff's reply memorandum to defendant's opposition to #9 motion. | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Rose M. Mooney, Esq. in support of #9 motion. | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to #9 motion. filed by Robert J. Morrissey |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.