Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Xxxxx, Xxxxxx, Xxxxx, Xxxxx, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Citibank, N.A. Not In Its Individual Capacity, But Soley As Separate Trustee For Pmt Npl Financing 2015-1, Mfra Trust 2015-1, Planet Home Lending, Llc, Pnmac Capital Management, Llc, Wilmington Trust National Association, (total of 5) See All represented by Polansky, Esq., Kevin Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Sarah W. Ellis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSarah W. Ellis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: February 03, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: February 03, 2023Exhibits/Appendix Exhibits A through H for Motion P#8 and Memorandum in Support of Motion
Date: February 15, 2023Exhibits/Appendix Exhibits to Paper #7 Exhibits A through J (omitting F and G)
Date: February 15, 2023Plaintiffs xxxxx xxxxx, xxxxxx xxxxx's Response to Order For The First Circuit's Decisions
Date: February 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) Pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(i), Plaintiffs xxxxx and xxxxxx xxxxx (collectively, the "Najdas") hereby give notice that this action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice. Defendants Wilmington Trust National Association, MFRA Trust 2015-1, Planet Home Lending, LLC, Citibank, N.A. not in its individual capacity, but solely as separate trustee for PMT NPL Financing 2015-1, and PNMAC Capital Management, LLC have not served an answer or motion for summary judgment in this action. Accordingly, Plaintiffs notice voluntary dismissal of this action, without prejudice. See Mass. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(i). Applies To: xxxxx, xxxxx (Plaintiff); xxxxx, xxxxxx (Plaintiff) | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for a Preliminary Injunction to enjoin (#8.0): ALLOWED Dated 2/17/23 After a two party hearing upon review of the pleadings arguments advanced and appropriate legal standings 1. The Plaintiff's Motion for P.I. to preclude foreclosure "non judicial" and auction of the subject property is ALLOWED. The defendants shall not take any steps to commence a foreclosure or auction of the property the defendants is to maintain the status quo regarding the mortgage and real estate interest. Neither party is to convey sell or assign any interest in the subject property. 2. The Plaintiff has made a showing of a likelihood of success on some of their claims. 3. If the Defendants foreclose the plaintiff's would suffer irreparable harm. 4. The injunction shall remain in place while the appeal in the first circuit and remand to the U.S. District Court for additional finding and entry of such findings are pending upon further findings or an order regarding subject property and case action number 14-13593-GAO, This matter shall be scheduled promptly for further hearing and trial. 5. In accord with mass r. civ. p. 65 (c) the Plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $9,700.00 (one month of property taxes and insurance at $6039.87 plus previously agreed to mortgage payment by way of promissory note). Said security shall be posted no later than Tuesday Feb 21, 2023 at 4pm Eastern Standard Time and this P.I. shall dissolve by Feb22, 23 at 4PM. If said security is not timely thereafter security shall be posted no later than 4pm on the 21st of the month in the amount of $9,700. If positing is not timely made the P.I. shall dissolve by 4P.M. the next business day. SO ORDERED. (Ellis,J.) Copies mailed and emailed to Plaintiff and Defendants Attorney 2/17/23. | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 02/17/2023 01:30 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Sarah Weyland Ellis, Presiding Staff: Maria Pantos, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Ellis, Sarah Weyland |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendant's motion to Dissolve the Temporary Restraining Order filed by xxxxx xxxxx, xxxxxx xxxxx | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix Exhibits A through H for Motion P#8 and Memorandum in Support of Motion | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendants Wilmington Trust National Association, MFRA Trust 2015-1, Planet Home Lending, LLC, Citibank, N.A. not in its individual capacity, but soley as separate trustee for PMT NPL Financing 2015-1, PNMAC Capital Management, LLC's Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order and Opposition to Motion For Preliminary Injunction | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs xxxxx xxxxx, xxxxxx xxxxx's EMERGENCY, EX PARTE Motion to Amend the Temporary Restraining Order and Cancel the Rescheduled February 17, 2023 Foreclosure Sale | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | xxxxx xxxxx, xxxxxx xxxxx's Memorandum in support of Motion For Preliminary Injunction to Enjoin All Nonjudicial Foreclosure Sales | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs xxxxx xxxxx, xxxxxx xxxxx's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Enjoin All Nonjudicial Foreclosure Sales | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix Exhibits to Paper #7 Exhibits A through J (omitting F and G) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.