Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jean, Yves, filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Fein, Esq., Christopher Joseph, against Fevrier, Jean, Fevrier, Joseph, Mitchell-Fevrier, Daphne, represented by Cook, Esq., Colleen C, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Christopher K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2022 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: July 29, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: July 29, 2022Yves Jean's Memorandum in opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint
Date: October 11, 2022Opposition to to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by
Date: October 11, 2022Defendant Daphne Mitchell-Fevrier's Motion to Dismiss (Hearing Requested)
Date: October 11, 2022Yves Jean's Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 11, 2022Defendants Daphne Mitchell-Fevrier, Joseph Fevrier, Jean Fevrier's Notice of Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 27, 2022Plaintiff Yves Jean's Motion to Reconsider Decision on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 13, 2023Rule 9A list of documents filed.
Date: October 11, 2022Defendant Daphne Mitchell-Fevrier's Notice of Filing (re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)
Date: October 11, 2022Reply/Sur-reply in support of Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9C Applies To: Cook, Esq., Colleen C (Attorney) on behalf of Fevrier, Jean, Fevrier, Joseph, Mitchell-Fevrier, Daphne (Defendant) | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Cook, Esq., Colleen C (Attorney) on behalf of Fevrier, Jean, Fevrier, Joseph, Mitchell-Fevrier, Daphne (Defendant) | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Daphne Mitchell-Fevrier, Joseph Fevrier, Jean Fevrier's Motion to Partially Strike Notice of Appeal (Memorandum Incorporated) | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Yves Jean's Certificate of Transcript Ordering (Plaintiff Yves Jean's Certification of Transcript Ordering) | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's NOTICE OF APPEAL: Appeal of the Court's Order and Judgment on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss as will as the Denial of the Motion for Reconsideration. Applies To: Jean, Yves (Plaintiff) | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for reconsideration (#10.0): DENIED "After review of the parties' positions, the motion to reconsider is denied. I understand that Plaintiff disagrees with my decision, but the motion to reconsider relies upon the same law and arguments relied upon with respect to the motion to dismiss, and thus provides no basis for reconsideration. Judge: Barry-Smith, Hon. Christopher K | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Fein, Esq., Christopher Joseph (Attorney) on behalf of Jean, Yves (Plaintiff) | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Decision on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Applies To: Mitchell-Fevrier, Daphne (Defendant); Fevrier, Joseph (Defendant); Fevrier, Jean (Defendant) | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Yves Jean's Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Decision on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Yves Jean's Motion to Reconsider Decision on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.