Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fitzgerald, Kathryn, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Callanan, Esq., Christopher A, against Athenahealth, Inc., represented by Lewis, Esq., Brian Eric, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 30, 2021Answer to original complaint Applies To: Athenahealth, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: November 29, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 30, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 09/30/2021
Date: September 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiff Kathryn Fitzgerald (f/k/a Kathryn Burgner) and Defendant athenahealth, Inc., pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii) that this action shall be and hereby is dismissed, with prejudice, without costs or attorney's fees to any party, and waiving all rights to appeal. Applies To: Fitzgerald, Kathryn (Plaintiff); Athenahealth, Inc. (Defendant) | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to original complaint Applies To: Athenahealth, Inc. (Defendant) | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Brian Eric Lewis, Esq. added for Defendant Athenahealth, Inc. | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for 10/12/2021, in hand to Christopher Mayers, 45 School Street Suite 202 Cogency Global Inc., Boston, MA 02108 Applies To: Athenahealth, Inc. (Defendant) | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 09/30/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.