Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Whiteside, Keith, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Soto, Esq., Jonathan Neftali, against Ean Holdings, Llc, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Of Boston, Llc, Evora, Zeleeza, represented by Cote, Esq., Laurence Bristol, Downing, Esq., Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with David A. Deakin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 30, 2021Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: April 24, 2023Exhibits/Appendix Joint Appendix
Date: December 26, 2022Opposition to to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by
Date: December 26, 2022Received from Defendant EAN Holdings, LLC: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: December 10, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: September 30, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 09/30/2021
Date: September 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 11/16/2023 09:00 AM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. David A Deakin, Presiding
Judge: Deakin, David A |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 11/09/2023 03:00 PM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. David A Deakin, Presiding
Judge: Deakin, David A |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal The parties to the above-entitled action, pursuant to the provisions of Mass.R.Civ.P. Rule 41(a)(l)(ii), hereby stipulate that said action be dismissed as to all counts and claims with prejudice and without interest or costs, waiving all rights of appeal. Applies To: Whiteside, Keith (Plaintiff); Evora, Zeleeza (Defendant) | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 11/16/2023 Time: 09:00 AM Result: Not Held | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 11/16/2023 Time: 09:00 AM | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 04/24/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith, Presiding
Judge: Barry-Smith, Christopher K |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 02/28/2023 10:36:01 | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 02/28/2023 10:35:10 | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56 (#7.0): Other action taken After hearing and review of the pleadings, the motion is ALLOWED without opposition to defendants EAN Holdings, and enterprise Rent A Car company of Boston, LLC. The motion with regards to Evora is DENIED as there exists questions of material facts/ evidence , both direct and indirect which are reserved for the fact finder and cannot be adjudicated as a matter of law under the Rule 56 standard. Judge: Sarrouf, Camille |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.