Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Gallardo, Dora, Gallardo, Juan Carlos, Gomez, Erick R., Mazariegoes, Eleanora A., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Boyle, Esq., Leo V, Denker, Esq., Jennifer, Mair, Esq., Victoria M, against Cambridge Health Alliance, Cambridge Housing Affordable Lending Llc, Cambridge Housing Authority, Lyndon B. Johnson Apartments, Llc, Monturio, Ashley, (total of 6) See All represented by Dunn, Esq., Mathew G, Guiney, Esq., Christine A, Pierce, Esq., Robert R, Shapiro, Esq., Beata, Sullivan, Esq., Mollie R, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Kristen Buxton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Affidavit of Ashley Monturio
Date: February 28, 2024Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 11, 2021Affidavit of Thomas M. Hoopes, Esq.
Date: December 23, 2021Received from Defendant Monturio, Ashley: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: November 23, 20213rd Party Complaint filed.
Date: November 23, 2021Complaint electronically filed.
Date: August 11, 2021Ashley Monturio, Michael Monturio's Memorandum in support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: February 28, 2024Defendants Ashley Monturio, Michael Monturio's Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56 (PARTIAL)
Date: February 28, 2024Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: August 16, 2023Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: October 05, 2022Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: September 08, 2022Defendant Cambridge Housing Authority: Answer to Amended Third-Party Complaint;
Date: September 06, 2022Defendants Ashley Monturio, Michael Monturio's Request for Hearing
Date: February 28, 2024Defendants Ashley Monturio, Michael Monturio's Notice of Filing and List of Documents
Date: February 28, 2024Exhibits/Appendix
Date: February 28, 2024Reply/Sur-reply Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: February 28, 2024Withdrawal of attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: January 20, 2022Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 08/11/2021
Date: August 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Mollie R Sullivan, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Defendant Michael Monturio | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Mollie R Sullivan, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Defendant Ashley Monturio | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for court to accept late filing of summary judgment papers ( assented to) (#22.0): ALLOWED Allowed. Dated March 25, 2024. Notices sent on 03/26/2024 Judge: Tingle, Hon. Brent A | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Ashley Monturio | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Ashley Monturio, Michael Monturio's Memorandum in support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants Ashley Monturio, Michael Monturio's Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56 (PARTIAL) | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants Ashley Monturio, Michael Monturio's Request for Hearing | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants Ashley Monturio, Michael Monturio's Assented to Motion for Court to Accept Late Filing of Summary Judgment Papers | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants Ashley Monturio, Michael Monturio's Notice of Filing and List of Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.