Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Middlesex Savings Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zall, Esq., William Michael, against Skelly, James J., in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with S. Jane Haggerty presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 By Clerk Presiding: Hon. S. Jane Haggerty Judgment For: Middlesex Savings Bank Judgment Against: James J. Skelly Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 09/26/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 01/19/2017 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 46375.69 Other Costs: 370.09 Crt Ord Atty Fee: 2950.00 Judgment Total: 51,450.40 | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Assessment of Damages (#5.0): Other action taken After review and hearing, damages are assessed in the amount of $49,325.69 which includes attorney's fees in the amount of $2,950.00 and costs in the amount of $370.09. Judgment shall issue accordingly. Dated: January 19, 2017 | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Plaintiff's Affidavit of Damages | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled Reason: Defendant failed to appear | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Request of Plaintiff | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 12/06/2016 14:38:19 | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Middlesex Savings Bank's Motion for Assessment Od Damages And Default Judgment And Default Judgment (Mass.R.Civ.P.55 (b)& 55 (b)(4) | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of William Zall in support of Application For Assessment Of Attorney Fees | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Timothy D. Wilson Of Damages | |
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Middlesex Savings Bank's Memorandum Of Damages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.