Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arbella Mutual Insurance Co., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bonfiglio, Esq., Joseph P, against Pimental, Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Christopher K Barry-Smith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 31, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Execution Issued: Execution Judgment Debtor: Pimental, Arthur Judgment Creditor: Arbella Mutual Insurance Co. as subrogee of Donald Tavis Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 03/31/2017 Judgment Total: 38,016.37 Post Judgment Int. Rate: .12 Post Judgment Int. Total: 812.98 Execution Subtotal: 38,829.35 Execution Total: 38,829.35 | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)1 By Clerk Presiding: Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith Judgment For: Arbella Mutual Insurance Co. Judgment Against: Arthur Pimental Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 08/31/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 01/25/2017 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 35941.24 Other Costs: 336.90 Judgment Total: 38,016.37 | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)1 By Clerk Presiding: Hon. Christopher K Barry-Smith Judgment For: Arbella Mutual Insurance Co. Judgment Against: Arthur Pimental Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 08/31/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 01/25/2017 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 35941.24 Judgment Total: 37,679.47 | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Document: A Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was generated and sent to: Attorney: Joseph P. Bonfiglio, Esq. Defendant: Arthur Pimental | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Arbella Mutual Insurance Co. as subrogee of Donald Tavis's request for Default JUDGMENT 55(b)(1) Applies To: Pimental, Arthur (Defendant) | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Arbella Mutual Insurance Co. as subrogee of Donald Tavis's Memorandum in support of Motion for Assessment Of Damages | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Arbella Mutual Insurance Co. as subrogee of Donald Tavis's Motion for Assessment Of Damages | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Pimental, Arthur: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Arbella Mutual Insurance Co. as subrogee of Donald Tavis's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Pimental, Arthur (Defendant) | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend (#3.0): ALLOWED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.