Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Restrepo, Raul, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Najjar, Esq., Michael C, against Boston Harbor Cruises, Inc., Newton Airport Express, Inc., Nolan Associates, Llc., Plymouth Rock Assurance Corp., Rita'S Enterprises, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Bromley, Esq., John J, Knight, Esq., John Patrick, Kutylo, Esq., Janine Doherty, Lucey, Esq., Jeanette Marie, Merriam, Esq., Michael James, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Barrett, C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Answer to the crossclaim And Jury Demand Applies To: Rita's Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: November 04, 2020Answer to the crossclaim Applies To: Verbatim Advisory Group LLC (Defendant)
Date: November 04, 2020Received from Defendant Rita's Enterprises, Inc.: Answer to the Crossclaims and Jury Demand
Date: September 14, 2020Amended: Fourth amended complaint filed by Raul Restrepo
Date: August 05, 2020Plaintiff Raul Restrepo's Motion to Allow Fourth Amended Complaint
Date: August 05, 2020Received from Defendant Rita's Enterprises, Inc: Answer to the Crossclaim;
Date: July 20, 2020Received from Defendant Wetzonis, Paul: Answer to the Crossclaim;
Date: July 20, 2020Plaintiff Raul Restrepo's Reply of Affidavit of Atty. Michael Najjar.
Date: December 18, 2019Endorsement on Motion to continue (#38.0): ALLOWED Judge: Barrett, Hon. C. William
Date: December 16, 2019Affidavit as to no opposition
Date: June 06, 2019Amended: (Third) amended complaint filed by Raul Restrepo
Date: June 06, 2019Affidavit as to No Opposition pursuant to Superior Court Rule 9A
Date: May 13, 2019Plaintiff Raul Restrepo's Motion to Further Amend Complaint
Date: May 13, 2019Received from Defendant Boston Harbor Cruises, Inc.: Answer to the Crossclaim;
Date: October 06, 2017Received from Defendant Verbatim Advisory Group LLC: Answer to the Crossclaim;
Date: September 18, 2017Amended Answer (Second To Comolaint Applies To: Wetzonis, Paul (Defendant)
Date: May 08, 2017Service Returned for Defendant Wetzonis, Paul: Service made in hand;
Date: August 17, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: June 30, 2016Defendant, Plaintiff Raul Restrepo, Paul Wetzonis's Joint Motion to Joint Motion To Amend.
Date: November 04, 2020Answer to the crossclaim Applies To: Nolan Associates, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: October 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Raul Restrepo, Paul Wetzonis, Plymouth Rock Assurance Corp., Verbatim Advisory Group LLC, Boston Harbor Cruises, Inc., Rita's Enterprises, Inc., Nolan Associates, LLC., Newton Airport Express, Inc.'s original complaint pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) , all rights of appeal waived | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Paul Schor, Esq. added for Defendant Newton Airport Express, Inc. | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer to the crossclaim And Jury Demand Applies To: Rita's Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant) | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer to the crossclaim Applies To: Verbatim Advisory Group LLC (Defendant) | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to (#58.0): ALLOWED After Review of the docket and current posture , motion is Allowed. There should be no further continuance in light of the age of the case and ample time now provided to complete all discovery. Judge: Sarrouf, Camille
Judge: CamilleSarrouf |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Defendant, Plaintiff Raul Restrepo, Paul Wetzonis's Joint Motion to Joint Motion To Amend. | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Crossclaim filed see paper #60 | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer to the crossclaim Applies To: Nolan Associates, LLC. (Defendant) | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer to the crossclaim of Rita's Enterprises, Inc., affirmative defenses, and jury demand of Newton Airport Express, Inc. | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Newton Airport Express, Inc.: Answer to the Crossclaim of Nolan Associates, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.