Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
The Chestnut Hill Market Center,Llc, filed a(n) Torts case represented by Merrill, Jr., Esq., Jack, against Rondeau, Jeffrey, Sheehan, Maureen, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with S. Jane Haggerty presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
|
ORDER: ASSESSMENT OF DAMAGES: Dated: January 19, 2017
Date: January 19, 2017Defendant Maureen Sheehan's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus
Date: December 30, 2016Plaintiff The Chestnut Hill Market Center,LLC's Motion of Damages And Entry of Default Judgment
Date: November 17, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 05, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Presiding: Hon. S. Jane Haggerty Judgment For: The Chestnut Hill Market Center,LLC Judgment Against: Maureen Sheehan Jeffrey Rondeau Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 10/05/2015 Jdgmnt Date: 01/30/2017 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 1395516.07 Costs Pd to Court: 1217.00 Crt Ord Atty Fee: 15783.50 Judgment Total: 1,634,273.84 | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER: ASSESSMENT OF DAMAGES: Dated: January 19, 2017 | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Habeas corpus issued as to Maureen Sheehan at MCI - Framingham for 01/18/2017 02:00 PM Damage Assessment Hearing. | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Motion Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Maureen Sheehan's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Motion Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Not Held Reason: Not reached by Court | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 12/12/2016 14:23:34 | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 11/18/2016 11:31:58 | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff The Chestnut Hill Market Center,LLC's Motion of Damages And Entry of Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.