Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ottenberg, John C., filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Ottenberg, Esq., John Charles, against Atwood, Gwendolyn Coke, represented by Hickey, Esq., William J, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2015 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) without prejudice. Applies To: Ottenberg, John C. (Plaintiff); Atwood, Gwendolyn Coke (Defendant) | |
February 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend time for (#2.0): Filing Responsive Pleading Pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. Pro. 6 (Court received this 2-11-15) ALLOWED (Dated: 2/11/2015) notice sent 2/19/15 | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Defendant Gwendolyn Coke Atwood in support of motion to enlarge time. Applies To: Hickey, Esq., William J. (Attorney) on behalf of Atwood, Gwendolyn Coke (Defendant) | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date William J. Hickey, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Gwendolyn Coke Atwood | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Defendant Gwendolyn Coke Atwood's EX PARTE Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) Answer | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Atwood, Gwendolyn Coke: Service made at last and usual; 117 Seymour St., Concord, MA Applies To: Atwood, Gwendolyn Coke (Defendant) | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type D13, Track A. | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.