Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Mccool, Thomas E., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Zaroulis, Esq., Andrew J, against Mortensen, Eugene, represented by Matusewicz, Esq., Michelle Ann, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2014 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal, Thomas E. McCool failed to comply with an ORDER of the Court dated 04/26/2016. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: That the plaintiff's complaint be and hereby is dismissed. | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to dismiss (#8.0): ALLOWED Upon consideration, there being no opposition, the motion is ALLOWED. Dated: December 29, 2016 | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Eugene Mortensen's Memorandum in support of Motion to dismiss for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the April 25, 2016 Order of this Court to complete necessary Probate filings | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Eugene Mortensen's Motion to dismiss for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the April 25, 2016 Order of this Court to complete necessary Probate filings | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Matusewicz, Esq., Michelle Ann (Attorney) on behalf of Mortensen, Eugene (Defendant) | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for leave (#7.0): ALLOWED The Assistant clerk shall schedule a status conference. Dated: December 5, 2016 | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John F. Laderoute, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Thomas E. McCool | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Thomas E. McCool's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for the Plaintiff; Memorandum in Support and Affidavit of Compliance | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: SCHEDULING ORDER After hearing from the parties, I issue the following scheduling order: 1. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days to complete the necessary filings in the Probate Court. Failure to comply with this first step may be grounds for dismissal as the death occurred more than one year ago. 2. All discovery shall be completed on or before October 24, 2016. 3. All Rule 56 motions to be served on or before November 24, 2016. 4. All Rule 56 motions to be filed on or before December 23, 2016 Dated: April 25, 2016 | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 04/21/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.