Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
95 Maple Street Limited Partnership, Jeremiah O'Reilly And Associates, Ltd, O'Reilly, Jeremiah, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kelley, Esq., Kathleen, O'Connor, Esq., David Michael, against Joseph Cunningham, Individually & D B A Joe Cunningham Companies, Kiarabel, Llc, represented by Mcbride, Esq., David Charles, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Paul D. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Execution returned: satisfied In Full | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 10/17/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: DECISION EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: After hearing this day, the Defendant being present but without his counsel of record, the Court hereby orders that the Temporary Restraining Order entered October 5, 2016 at 4pm is extended until the return date of October 17, 2016 at 2pm in Courtroom 710. This TRO will remain in full force and effect until the return date, October 17, 2016, when all counsel of record will be present for a further hearing on the matter. Should the parties resolve their dispute prior to the October 17, 2016 return date, then they shall make a joint status report to the Court so advising the Court and the matter will be taken off the schedule and the TRO will be dissolved. (See scanned image). Dated: October 7, 2016. Copies mailed 10/12/16. | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 10/07/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Kathleen A. Kelley. Filed in Court. | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: WE NOTIFY YOU that application has been made in said action, as appears in the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. And that a hearing upon such application will be held at the court house at said Court Woburn, in said county, on 10/7/2015 A.D. at 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 710 at which time you may appear and show cause why such application should not be granted. In the meantime, until such hearing, WE COMMAND YOU, said Defendant Joseph Cunningham and your agents, attorneys and counselors, and each and every one of them, to desist and refrain from dissipating, distributing, encumbering, transferring, conveying or using any and all proceeds from the sale of 39 Pleasant Street, Stoneham, MA. This temporary restraining order is in effect until the return date and time 2:00 pm on Friday, October 7, 2016. (See scanned image) | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) 95 Maple Street Limited Partnership, Jeremiah O'Reilly And Associates, LTD, Jeremiah O'Reilly's EMERGENCY, EX PARTE Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Short Order of Notice. Filed in Court. After hearing, the Court finds that there will be immediate injury if the proceeds from the sale of 39 Pleasant Street in Stoneham are dissipated before this judgment creditor has an opportunity to depose Joseph Cunningham and Kiarabel, LLC. Now, therefore this Court orders that Joseph Cunningham himself or any agent acting on his behalf, shall be temporarily restrained from dissipating, distributing, encumbering, transferring, conveying or using any and all proceeds from the sale of 39 Pleasant Street. This TRO is in effect until the return date and time 2:00 pm on Friday October 7, 2016. (Connolly, J.). Copy given in hand. | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | 95 Maple Street Limited Partnership, Jeremiah O'Reilly And Associates, LTD, Jeremiah O'Reilly's MOTION for appointment of Special Process Server. David Ayles, Quickserv. Motion ALLOWED. (Connolly, J.). Copy given in hand. | |
September 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Execution issued on the judgment dated 02/20/2015, (#14.0) against the following party(s): Joseph Cunningham, Individually & d/b/a Joe Cunningham Companies, Kiarabel, LLC in favor of 95 Maple Street Limited Partnership, Jeremiah O'Reilly And Associates, LTD, Jeremiah O'Reilly. In the amount of 183,326.85. AMENDED EXECUTION ISSUED AS PER PLEADING #16 WITH UPDATED INTEREST Applies To: O'Connor, Esq., David Michael (Attorney) on behalf of Jeremiah O'Reilly And Associates, LTD (Plaintiff) | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Duplicate Execution (#16.0): ALLOWED (Dated: 9/21/16) notice sent 9/23/16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.