Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Raymond Bandar, Member And Or Manager Of 18 Whitney Street, Llc, Raymond Bandar, Member And Or Manager Of Star Lane, Llc, Raymond Bandar, Member And Or Manager Of Kensington Chambers, Llc, Raymond Bandar, Member And Or Manager 438 Somerville Avenue, Llc, Raymond Bandar, Member And Or Manager Of 19 Whitney Street, Llc, (total of 13) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Perry, Esq., Daniel C, Mello, Esq., Amy S, Deshaies, Esq., Marc R, against Estate Of William H. Walsh, Through The Administratrix Of Mary, represented by Meltzer, Esq., Robert Nathaniel, Killeen, Esq., Matthew D, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Christine M. McEvoy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2013 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Attorney's Liens | |
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal: failure to comply with nisi order (Christine M. McEvoy, Justice). Copies mailed 4/9/2013 | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 3/21/2013 (Jane Haggerty, Justice) | |
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 2/2/2013 (Kirpalani, J.) | |
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event | See lead case Raymond Bandar, Manager of MDG Group, LLC v. Mary Hayes Walsh, Administratrix of the Estate of William Walsh, Ogunquit Development Corporation, etal MICV2010-2507, for FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR CONTEMPT BROUGHT BY OGUNQUIT DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, FIRST CAMREAL CORPORATION, MUIREANN GLEN MULLEN and LEINSTER ONE, LLC. ON JUNE 6, 2012. (which see pgs. 1-7) ORDER FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT: In accordance with the foregoing, Raymond Bandar is adjudged in contempt of the Amended Preliminary Injunction of June 1, 2011 and shall be liable for the fees and expenses of the complaining parties in prosecuting this complaint for contempt. The complaining parties are directed to serve, in accordance with the procedures dictated by Superior Court Rule 9A, a motion for an award of costs and fees supported by appropriate affidavit(s) within 30 days of the date of the entry of this order on the docket. (Maynard M. Kirpalani, Associate Justice of the Superior Court) Dated December 18, 2012 and copies mailed 12/20/2012, pleading# 40 | |
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER ON MOTION OF THE DEFENDANT, MARY HAYES WALSH, ADMX. TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT OF RAYMOND BANDAR: Which See (2) pages. Dated: August 29, 2012 (Maynard M. Kirpalani, Justice). Copies mailed | |
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER (amended complaint) see lead case MICV 10-2507 Raymond Bandar manager of MDG Group LLC Et al | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Defendant Estate Of William H. Walsh, Through The Administratrix Of Mary's MOTION to Dismiss (MRCP 12b) the Amended Complaint of Raymond Bandar, Individually And As Trustee And/Or Beneficiary Of 36, for failure to satisfy the Court's prior Order of Specifity and for failure to provide sufficient documentation to satisfy the Status of Frauds; Plaintiff's opposition to deft's motion | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | See lead case MICV 2010-2507 Raymond Bandar, Manager of MDG Group, LLC., etal V. May Hayes Walsh, Administratrix, et als, Verified Complaint for Contempt brought by Ogunquit Development Corporation, Muireann Glenmullen, First Camreal Corporation, and Leinster One, LLC. After hearing, amended complaint to be filed and response within seven (7) days. Trial scheduled for 7-19-12 at 2:00 PM. (Budd, J.) Dated 6/5/12 and copies mailed 6/12/12 | |
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event | See lead case MICV 2010-2507 Raymond Bandar, Manager of MDG Group, LLC v. Mary Hayes Walsh, Adminiistratrix, etals , for Motion to Quash and or Limit Subpoena, pleading# 35 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.