Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rosen, Herbert C., Rosen, Lois R., filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Gossels, Esq., C. Peter R, against Ddl Services, Inc., Completely Clean Corporation, Whole Foods Market, Inc., represented by Segalini, Jr., Esq., Roland, Wolmuth, Esq., Heidi Robyn, Bazarian, Esq., Stephen C, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2012 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice; Pursuant to MRCP 41(a)(1)(ii), all parties to this action, through the undersigned counsel, herby stipulate and agree that this action, including all corss-claims and counterclaims, be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, All rights of appeal are hereby waived. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER by Completely Clean Corporation to CROSSCLAIM of DDL Services, Inc. | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Completely Clean Corporation, Inc.'s ANSWER to Wholefoods' Cross-Claim | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Completely Clean Corporation(Defendant) | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion (P#10) ALLOWED. The default may be vacated and answer may be docketed. Dated: March 7, 2012 (Henry, J.) Notices mailed 3/9/2012 | |
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Assented To Motion To Remove Default Judgment Against Completely Clean Corporation, Inc. | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER by DDL Services Inc to CROSSCLAIM of Whole Foods Market Group | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CROSSCLAIM of Whole Foods Market, Inc. v DDL Services, Inc. | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER by Whole Foods Market, Inc. to COMPLAINT (claim of trial by jury reqstd) and cross claim | |
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Default (1-88) re: Completely Clean Corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.