Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Farrington, John, Farrington, Sarah, Lang, Peter, Lapierre, Katherine, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case represented by Bracken, Esq., Thomas B, against Cambridge Planning Board, Hugh Russell, Member Planning Board City Of Cambridge, Lesley University, Pamela Winters, Member Planning Board City Of Cambridge, Steven Winter, Member Planning Board City Of Cambridge, (total of 7) See All represented by Buland, Esq., Vali, Feeherry, Esq., Anthony Martin, Murray, Esq., Michael K, Pugh, Esq., R. Chad, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Robert A. Mulligan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2011 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeZoning |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Transferred from Middlesex County Superior Court Superior Court to the Permit Session of the Land Court | |
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER OF TRANSFER: Pursuant to the authority contained in G.L. c. 211B, sec 9 and G.L c. 185 sec 3A, the above-entitled matter is hereby transferred from the Superior Court Department to the Permit Session of the Land Court Department. Dated: June 13, 2011 (Robert A. Mulligan, Justice) | |
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Court received: Declaration of compliance with Notice Requirements of G,L.Cc. 40 A, 17 | |
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER by Lesley University to COMPLAINT (claim of trial by jury reqstd) | |
May 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer medical bills as evidence, pursuant to MGLc 233, sec 79G, By certified mail, return receipt attached | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type C02, Track F. | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Appeal from Cambridge, MA Zoning Board filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.