Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Farrington, John, Farrington, Sarah, Lang, Peter, Lapierre, Katherine, filed a(n) Actions Involving The State/Municipality case represented by Bracken, Esq., Thomas B, against Berg, Member Historical Commission, Shary, Bibbins, Member Historical Commission, Wyllis, Cambridge Historical Commission, Crocker, Member Histroical Commission, Robert G., Ferrara, Member Historical Commission, Joseph V., (total of 12) See All represented by Buland, Esq., Vali, Feeherry, Esq., Anthony Martin, Gouker, Esq., Dominic D, Murray, Esq., Michael K, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Robert A. Mulligan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2011 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Status review notice returned see attached Order (#5) | |
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Status review notice returned Removed to Land Court by Order of Transfer dated 3/31/2011. Land Court Docket #11 PS448568. Land Court Decision issued on 5/18/2012. Notice of Appeal has been filed. | |
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event | STATUS REVIEW of DOCKET. Copies mailed 6/26/2012 | |
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs review for answers' at service deadline review | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Transferred from Middlesex County Superior Court Superior Court to the Permit Session of the Land Court Department | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER OF TRANSFER: Pursuant to the authority contained in G.L. c. 311B, sec 9 and G.L. c. 185, sec 3A, the above-entitled matter is hereby transferred from the Superior Court Department to the Permit Session of the Land Court Department. Dated: March 31, 2011 (Robert A. Mulligan, Justice) | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER by Cambridge Historical Commission, William B. King, Member Historical Commission, Bruce Irving, Member Historical Commission, Wyllis Bibbins, Member Historical Commission, Robert G. Crocker, Member Histroical Commission, Chandra Harrington, Member Historical Commission, Frank Shirley, Member Historical Commission, Jo M. Solet, Member Historical Commission, Shary Berg, Member Historical Commission, Joseph V. Ferrara, Member Historical Commission, Susannah Barton Tobin, Member Historical Commission to COMPLAINT (claim of trial by jury reqstd) | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER by Lesley University to COMPLAINT (claim of trial by jury reqstd) | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Defendant, Lesley University Corporate Disclosure Statement filed. | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Attys Anthony M Feeherry Michael K Murray and Dominic D Goukers notice of appearance for Lesley University |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.