Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hariharan, Sahasranam, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Goar, Esq., Dudley Clive, against Slivko, Jacqueline, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Shelley M. Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2011 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Execution returned: satisfied Applies To: Goar, Esq., Dudley Clive (Attorney) on behalf of Hariharan, Sahasranam (Plaintiff) | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Execution Issued: Execution Judgment Debtor: Slivko, Jacqueline Judgment Creditor: Hariharan, Sahasranam Terms of Execution: EXON Issuance Date: 12/01/2016 Judgment Total: 41,243.85 Post Judgment Int. Rate: .12 Post Judgment Int. Total: 1,926.83 Execution Subtotal: 43,170.68 Execution Total: 43,170.68 | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Judgment on Jury Verdict After Jury Verdict Presiding: Hon. Thomas P Billings Judgment For: Sahasranam Hariharan Judgment Against: Jacqueline Slivko Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 01/18/2011 Jdgmnt Date: 07/12/2016 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 24700.00 Filing Fees: 275.00 Judgment Total: 41,243.85 Further Orders: It if further ORDERED that the Defendants Counterclaims against the Plaintiff be and hereby are Dismissed. | |
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for New Trial Pursuant to M.R. Civ. P. Rule 59(a) or alternatively for Amendment of the Judgment Pursuant to M.R.Civ.P., Rule 59(e), filed by the Plaintiff (#110.0): DENIED Without hearing. | |
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Pleading #110 sent to Judge Billings sitting at Worcester Superior Court. | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Jacqueline Slivko Applies To: Slivko, Jacqueline (Defendant) | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Jacqueline Slivko's Request for A Hearing on Defendant's motion for New Trial pursuant to M.R. Civ. P., Rule 59(A) or alternatively for amendment of the judgment pursuant to M.R.Civ. P., Rule 59 (E) | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendant's Motion for New Trial or Alternatively for Amendment of the Judgment filed by Sahasranam Hariharan | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Jacqueline Slivko's Memorandum of Law | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Jacqueline Slivko's Motion for New Trail Pursuant to M.R. Civ.P. , Rule 59(a) or alternatively for amendment of the Judgment pursuant to M.R. Civ. P., 59(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.