Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Boars Head, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Lawlor, Esq., Peter V, against Epsilon Group, Llc, Town Of Chelmsford Historic District Commission, represented by Costa, Esq., Adam Joseph, Bobrowski, Esq., Mark, Cantor, Esq., Patricia A, Bayer, Esq., Megan B, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Robert A. Mulligan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2010 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, with all parties waiving any rights of appeal and with the parties each bearing their own expenses and costs | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Defendant Epsilon Group's Assent to Motion to Dismiss By Plaintiffs | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Plaiintiff's Motion To Dismiss | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to the authority contained in G.L. c. 211B, sec 9, Justice Gordon H. Piper of the Land Court Department is hereby assigned to sit in the Superior Court Department. All proceedings may be held in a courtroom currently assigned to the Land Court Department and the staff of said Department may assist Justice Piper in carrying out his duties and responsibilities under this Order. Dated: July 9, 2010 (Robert A. Mulligan, Justice) | |
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Request for Interdepartmental Judicial Assignment Pursuant to Trial Court Rule XII/Boars Head, LLC vs. Epsilon et al | |
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Rule 9c certificate of compliance of deft Town Of Chelmsford Historic District Commission | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Defendants' Joint MOTION for Protective Order for Dennis Ready, Alternate Member of Defendant Town Of Chelmsford Historic District Commission, Plaintiff's opposition to defts' motion | |
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER by Town Of Chelmsford Historic District Commission, Epsilon Group, LLC to COMPLAINT (claim of trial by jury reqstd) | |
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Amended ANSWER by Town Of Chelmsford Historic District Commission, Epsilon Group, LLC to COMPLAINT (claim of trial by jury reqstd) | |
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER by Epsilon Group, LLC to COMPLAINT (claim of trial by jury reqstd) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.