Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bevilacqua Paving ,Corp., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Caprioli, Esq., Nicole B, against Washington Square Condominium, Earthworks Site Development & Utilities, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Timothy Q. Feeley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2008 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Execution issued for plaintiff v Earthworks Site Development & Utilities in amount of $49,199.08, including interest and costs, issued to plaintiff's Attorney Nicole B Caprioli. | |
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Plff's Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) as to deft Washington Square Condominium, with prejudice | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Case status changed to 'Needs status review' at answer deadline review | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Default re: Washington Square Condominium (no answer by 1-88 deadline); Pltf directed to move for appropriate judgement by 11/09/2008. Copies mailed. | |
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT (pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P. 54(b): This action came on before the Court, Timothy Q. Feeley, Justice, presiding, and upon Plaintiff's request for Default Judgment and Motion for entry of separate and final Judgment pursuant to Mass.R. Civ. P. 54(b) and the Court having found and determined that there is no just reason for delay in the entry of final Judgment and therefore allowed said motion, and upon consideration thereof, It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: That the plaintiff, Bevilacqua Paving, Corp. recover of the defendant Earthworks Site Development & Utilities ONLY, the sum of $44,437.00 with interest from 12/29/2007 to 08/27/2008 in the amount of $3,535.51 and its costs of action, as provided by law. Dated at Woburn, Massachusetts this 27th day of August, 2008. (Timothy Q. Feeley, Justice). Entered on docket and copies mailed 8/28/2008 | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 54(b) against Defendant, Earthworks Site Development & Utilities; Affidavit of Linda O'Brien. | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk for default judgment (55b1) re: Earthworks Site Development & Utilities by Bevilacqua Paving ,Corp. | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant(s) Earthworks Site Development & Utilities. Copies mailed 7/23/2008 | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Earthworks Site Development & Utilities by Bevilacqua Paving ,Corp. | |
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Washington Square Condominium, service made on 6/23/2008 (in hand) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.