Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Croce Electric Company, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Meagher, Esq., Kieran Brian, May, Jr., Esq., Walter R, against Safeco Insurance Company Of America, Xl Specialty Insurance Company, Fidelity And Deposit Insurance Company Of Maryland, Suffolk Construction Company, represented by Morog, Esq., Christopher W, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, MA, . Middlesex County, MA Superior Courts with Timothy Q. Feeley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2010 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal, Now come the parties, by their respective counsel and, pursuant to MASS. R. CIV.P. 41 (a)(1) (ii), stipuplate and agree that all claims which are or could have been advanced in the above-entitled matter are hereby dismissed, with prejudice, without costs, all rights of appeal being waived. | |
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-trial memorandum | |
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#10) ALLOWED. (Kimberly S. Budd, Justice) Dated & Notices mailed 12/14/2009 | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Croce Electric Company, Inc.'s emergency MOTION to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference | |
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#9) ALLOWED by assent. (Kimberly S. Budd, Justice) Dated & Notices mailed 10/19/2009 | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Croce Electric Company, Inc.'s Assented-to MOTION to continue Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 21, 2009 to date no sooner than December 15, 2009. | |
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion (P#8) ALLOWED by agreement. (Timothy Q. Feeley, Justice) Dated & Notices mailed 10/14/2008 | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Joint MOTION To Extend Tracking Order Deadlines: By 6 Months | |
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion (P#7) ALLOWED by agreement. Dated 8/27/08. (Timothy Q. Feeley, Justice) Notices mailed 8/28/2008 | |
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Joint MOTION to extend tracking deadlines for two months. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.