Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Irvin, Hadley, filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case represented by Ross, Iii, Esq., John D, against Nascimento, Jamie A., University Of Massachusetts, represented by Pro Se, Strayer, Esq., Kerry David, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts with Richard J. Carey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 24, 2017 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: February 07, 2020Pre-Trial ORDER: October 2020 Trial List
Date: February 11, 2020Party status: Defendant Nascimento, Jamie A.: Dismissed;
Date: March 19, 2018Received from Defendant Nascimento, Jamie A.: Answer to original complaint;
Date: November 03, 2017Service Returned for Defendant Nascimento, Jamie A.: Service made at last and usual;
Date: October 25, 2017Service Returned for Defendant University of Massachusetts: Service made in hand;
Date: October 16, 2017Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 24, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 24, 2017Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 08/24/2017
Date: August 24, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 04/05/2021 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding Staff: Harry Jekanowski, Jr., Clerk of Courts
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Hadley Irvin's Joint Motion to continue / reschedule an event 04/05/2021 09:00 AM Trial Ready | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event trial (joint) (#13.0): ALLOWED by agreement to July 2021 Trial List Judge: Jekanowski, Jr., Harry | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Kerry Strayer | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Hadley Irvin's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer as evidence: medical bills pursuant to G.L. c.233, § 79G | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 12/07/2020 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court due to Covid-19 Hon. Richard J Carey, Presiding
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 10/05/2020 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court due to Covid-19 Hon. Richard J Carey, Presiding
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial ORDER: October 2020 Trial List | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 02/10/2020 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Richard J Carey, Presiding
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.