Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Perry'S Auto Parts & Equipment Co., Inc,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bohnet, Esq., Jeffrey S, against Skuse, Jr., Martin E., represented by Martin, Esq., Damien John, Ugolini, Esq., Donald L, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts with Richard J. Carey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2017 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
General correspondence regarding Suggestion of Bankruptcy faxed
Date: October 12, 2017Service Returned for Defendant Skuse, Jr., Martin E.: Service made in hand;
Date: August 01, 2017Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: July 19, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 19, 2017Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 07/19/2017
Date: July 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal without Prejudice as to Perry's Auto Parts & Equipment Co., Inc,'s original complaint | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's filing of bankruptcy status report. Bankruptcy status: Pending in Bankruptcy Court sent to Donald L. Ugolini, Esq. 347 Gooseberry Road West Springfield, MA 01089 | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER sent for Status Review on Bankruptcy of Defendant, if notice is not received by 06/29/2018 the complaint will be dismissed. Applies To: Skuse, Jr., Martin E. (Defendant) | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order issued on Defendant Martin E. Skuse, Jr. suggestion of Bankruptcy (#9.0) Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Judge: Carey, Richard |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Suggestion of Bankruptcy faxed | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Damien John Martin, Esq. added for Defendant Martin E. Skuse, Jr. | |
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J The following event: Hearing on Motion for Attachment scheduled for 10/13/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled Reason: Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue hearing on real estate attachment (#8.0): ALLOWED by fax on 8/24/2017. Motion for attachment continued to October 13, 2017 at 2:00pm. | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event (#8.0): hearing on real estate attachment ALLOWED | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Perry's Auto Parts & Equipment Co., Inc,'s Motion to continue / reschedule an event 08/25/2017 02:00 PM Hearing on Motion for Attachment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.